Amazing Number Nine

IT IS VERY INTERESTING TAKE ANY NUMBER OF DIGITS. HERE I AM TAKING 25 AND 32

  • YOU CAN WRITE THEM IN FOUR WAYS LIKE THAT(25*32/25*23/52*23/52*32)

25*32=800

25*23=575

52*23=1196

52*32=1664

  • SUBTRACT BIGGER ONE TO ANY LOWER, ONE BY ONE

1664-1196=468=4+6+8=­18=1+8=9

1664-575=1089=1+0+8+­9=18=1+8=9

1164-800=864=8+6+4=1­8=1+8=9

1196-575=621=6+2+1=9

1196-800=396=3+6+9=1­8=1+8=9

800-575=225=2+2+5=9

Always THE SUM IS 9. IT IS TRUE FOR ANY DIGITS..

Here are some amazing numbers

A.

  • 26*22*1.75=1001
  • 26*22*3.5=2002
  • 26*22*5.25=3003
  • 26*22*7=4004
  • 26*22*8.75=5005
  • 26*22*10.5=6006
  • 26*22*12.25=7007
  • 26*22*14=8008
  • 26*22*15.75=9009
  • 26*22*17.5=10010

C.

  • 26*22*5.25=3003
  • 26*22*10.5=6006
  • 26*22*15.75=9009
  • 26*22*21=12012
  • 26*22*26.25=15015
  • 26*22*31.5=18018
  • 26*22*36.75=21021
  • 26*22*42=24024
  • 26*22*47.25=27027
  • 26*22*52.5=30030

B.

  • 26*22*3.5=2002
  • 26*22*7=4004
  • 26*22*10.5=6006
  • 26*22*14=8008
  • 26*22*17.5=10010
  • 26*22*21=12012
  • 26*22*24.5=14014
  • 26*22*28=16016
  • 26*22*31.5=18018
  • 26*22*35=20020

D.

  • 26*22*7=4004
  • 26*22*14=8008
  • 26*22*21=12012
  • 26*22*28=16016
  • 26*22*35=20020
  • 26*22*42=24024
  • 26*22*49=28028
  • 26*22*56=32032
  • 26*22*63=36036
  • 26*22*70=40040

[ad#ad-2]

Print Friendly, PDF & Email
The following two tabs change content below.

Piyush Goel

Latest posts by Piyush Goel (see all)

READ:   RSA: The Elegant Code
No Comments

Post A Comment